Lewis v. Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roger Lewis
Defendant: Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC and Kenneth Schroepfer
Case Number: 4:2020cv04017
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 4/22/2020. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 4/29/2020. Jury Trial set for the week of 4/26/2021 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 25, 2020. (rwg)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kenneth Schroepfer, Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC.(Rees, Raymond)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Reissued as to Kenneth Schroepfer, Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kenneth Schroepfer, Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lw)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC, and Kenneth Schroepfer for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Schroepfer, Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2080802), filed by Roger Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join -- Roger Lewis)(Sanford, Josh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (hnc)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Roger Lewis. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (hnc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Lewis
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Eye Pizza, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Douglas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Schroepfer
Represented By: Raymond Douglas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?