Edwards v. Griffey et al
Plaintiff: Dewayne Antonio Edwards
Defendant: Officer Leakes, Jane Doe, Officer Webb, Sergeant Griffey, Officer Salvador, Warden Walker, Officer Poole, Officer Ellis and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2020cv04040
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Officer Ellis, Sergeant Griffey, Officer Leakes, Officer Poole, Officer Salvador, Warden Walker, Officer Webb and USM285 Forms delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #13 First Amended Complaint, #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #15 Order Directing Service. (mll)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Officer Ellis, Sergeant Griffey, Officer Leakes, Officer Poole, Officer Salvador, Warden Walker, Officer Webb and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 2, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service).(mll)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Clerk to strike #9 Amended Complaint, #11 Second Amended Complaint filed by Dewayne Antonio Edwards. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 2, 2020. (mll)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Officer Webb, Warden Walker, Officer Salvador, John Doe, Sergeant Griffey, Officer Leakes, Officer Ellis, Jane Doe, Officer Poole filed by Dewayne Antonio Edwards.(mll) Modified on 7/2/2020. (mll)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to file signed amended complaint due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 24, 2020. (mll)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN PER #14 ORDER.*** SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #9 Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Dewayne Antonio Edwards. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Dewayne Antonio Edwards, #9 Amended Complaint filed by Dewayne Antonio Edwards.(cnn) Modified on 7/2/2020. (mll)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure require pleadings to be signed by a party or the attorney representing that party. Pursuant to Rule 11: [t]he court must strike an unsigned paper unless the omission is promptly corrected after being called to the attention of an attorney or party. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return a copy of the Amended Complaint to the Plaintiff for his signature. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to sign and date the Amended Complaint and return it to the Court within 14 days from the entry of this order. The case shall be subject to dismissal if the Plaintiff fails to return the dated and signed complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 6/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 8, 2020. (mlf)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN PER #14 ORDER.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Officer Webb, Warden Walker, Officer Salvador, John Doe, Sergeant Griffey, Officer Leakes, Officer Ellis, Jane Doe, Officer Poole filed by Dewayne Antonio Edwards.(mll) Modified on 7/2/2020. (mll)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed by 6/11/2020; ORDER withdrawing #6 Order Directing Service, #7 Summons Issued. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 21, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service).(mll)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 ***WITHDRAWN PER #8 ORDER.*** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Officer Ellis, Sergeant Griffey, Officer Leakes, Officer Poole, Officer Salvador, Warden Walker, Officer Webb and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983). (hnc) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/20/2020) (hnc). Modified on 5/21/2020. (mll)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 ***WITHDRAWN PER #8 ORDER.*** ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Officer Ellis, Sergeant Griffey, Officer Leakes, Officer Poole, Officer Salvador, Warden Walker, Officer Webb and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 19, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(hnc) Modified on 5/21/2020. (mll)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Miller County Correctional Facility to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $43.00; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (cnn)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 18, 2020. (cnn)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Dewayne Antonio Edwards. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against All Defendants, filed by Dewayne Antonio Edwards.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Griffey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Leakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Griffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Antonio Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?