Brown v. Markel American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jimmy L. Brown
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv04041
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Markel American Insurance Company. (Younger, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, Answer to Class Action Complaint by Markel American Insurance Company.(Younger, Robert)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Markel American Insurance Company to answer or otherwise respond by July 10, 2020. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 22, 2020. (mll)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, Markel American Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time by Markel American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Younger, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company. (Younger, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R Falasco on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company. (Falasco, Joseph)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company. (Chiles, E.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by Jimmy L. Brown. Markel American Insurance Company served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Scott, Timothy)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sach D Oliver on behalf of Jimmy L. Brown. (Oliver, Sach)
June 3, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Jimmy L. Brown. Complaint, #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorneys, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Sach D. Oliver, Jeffrey P. Leonard. (mll)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank H. Bailey on behalf of Jimmy L. Brown. (Bailey, Frank)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoff Hamby on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hamby, Geoff)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ryan Scott on behalf of Jimmy L. Brown. (Scott, Timothy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Ryan Scott on behalf of Jimmy L. Brown. (Scott, Timothy) Modified on 6/3/2020. (mll)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Markel American Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Markel American Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Montgomery, William)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Markel American Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2144495), filed by Jimmy L. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit Uninsured Motorist Rejection Form, #3 Exhibit Declarations Page, #4 Exhibit PIP Rejection Form, #5 Exhibit Letter from MAIC disclaiming coverage, #6 Exhibit Ark. Ins. Dep't. Company Lookup Summary for MAIC)(Montgomery, William)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jimmy L. Brown. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Markel American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy L. Brown
Represented By: William Blake Montgomery
Represented By: Geoff Hamby
Represented By: Frank H. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Scott
Represented By: Sach D Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: Joseph R Falasco
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?