Cox v. Runion et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Cox
Defendant: Sheriff Jackie Runion, Warden Jeffie Walker, Captain Golden Adams and Nurse Steven King
Case Number: 4:2021cv04021
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to sender. Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to forward. Mail originally sent to Shannon Cox at Miller County Detention Center including #8 Order of Dismissal. No new address available. (mll)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 26, 2021. (mll)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by April 1, 2021. (ECF No. 6). This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 10 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 6, 2021. (mlf)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff has not clearly stated how each named Defendant violated his federal constitutional rights, and some of his claims may be frivolous. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. Amended Complaint due by 4/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 11, 2021. (mlf)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Miller County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $30.85; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Miller County). (mll)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 11, 2021. (mll)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Shannon Cox. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Golden Adams, Steven King, Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker filed by Shannon Cox.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Runion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jackie Runion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jeffie Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Golden Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Steven King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?