Pro-Fab, LLC v. Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pro-Fab, LLC
Defendant: Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04032
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, filed by Pro-Fab, LLC. Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc. served on 4/17/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Caststeel, Ryan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc. for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Caststeel, Ryan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2366365), filed by Pro-Fab, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Caststeel, Ryan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Pro-Fab, LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pro-Fab, LLC v. Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Smith Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro-Fab, LLC
Represented By: Ryan J. Caststeel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?