Jones v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Tralynn D. Jones
Defendant: Sheriff Jackie Runion and Warden Jeffie Walker
Case Number: 4:2021cv04034
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 3, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiffs Consent, #2 Affidavit Defendant's consent)(sss)
May 27, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 10/25/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 27, 2021. (sss)
May 24, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker.(Jones, Jamie)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tralynn D. Jones. Jackie Runion served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Jeffie Walker served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (mll)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker and USM285 forms delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #7 Amended Complaint, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #11 Order Directing Service. (mll)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 27, 2021. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service).(mll)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Preserve Video Footage; denying #9 Motion to Subpoena. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 26, 2021. (mll)
April 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Subpoena Documents by Tralynn D. Jones. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
April 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Preserve Video Footage by Tralynn D. Jones. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker filed by Tralynn D. Jones.(mll)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff has not clearly stated how each named Defendant violated his federal constitutional rights, and some of his claims may be frivolous. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. Amended Complaint due by 5/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2021. (mlf)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Miller County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $10.00; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Miller County). (mll)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2021. (mll)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Tralynn D. Jones. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Jackie Runion, Jeffie Walker filed by Tralynn D. Jones.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Jackie Runion
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jeffie Walker
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tralynn D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?