Blount et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tommy Blount and Kahne Blount
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv04053
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Carson, Staci)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 9/30/2021. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 10/7/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2022 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 2, 2021. (rwg)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Carson, Staci)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Carson, Staci)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by Tommy Blount, Kahne Blount. (Originally filed in state court.)(mll)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Miller County Circuit Court, case number 46CV-21-277. filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C)(mll)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (mll)
August 13, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/16/2021. (mll)
August 13, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2442457.. (Carson, Staci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Blount
Represented By: Brett McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kahne Blount
Represented By: Brett McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Staci Dumas Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?