Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Texar Line Clearance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Defendant: Texar Line Clearance, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04061
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC). Texar Line Clearance, Inc. was sent waiver on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Dixon, Pamela)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa G. McPherson on behalf of All Defendants. (McPherson, Melissa)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Maurice Langdon on behalf of All Defendants. (Langdon, Brent)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Herrington on behalf of Texar Line Clearance, Inc.. (Herrington, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Texar Line Clearance, Inc., filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC).(Dixon, Pamela)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC). Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Texar Line Clearance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Represented By: Pamela Dixon
Represented By: Amy Black
Represented By: Faye A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texar Line Clearance, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L. Herrington
Represented By: Brent Maurice Langdon
Represented By: Melissa G. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?