Edwards v. Jaber et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Edwards
Defendant: Ahmad Jaber, F&T Transport Corp, MNN Development, Inc. and George TBR, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04085
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by F&T Transport Corp, George TBR, Inc., Ahmad Jaber, MNN Development, Inc.. (Williams, Taylor)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Ahmad Jaber and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Ahmad Jaber for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Neal, Jay)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 1/11/2022. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 1/18/2022. Jury Trial set for 1/17/2023 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 14, 2021. (rwg)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by F&T Transport Corp, George TBR, Inc., Ahmad Jaber.(Watts, Richard)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by MNN Development, Inc. (Originally filed in state court.)(mll)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against F&T Transport Corp, George TBR, Inc., Ahmad Jaber, MNN Development, Inc. filed by Melissa Edwards. (Originally filed in state court.)(mll)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by F&T Transport Corp, George TBR, Inc., Ahmad Jaber, MNN Development, Inc. (mll)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Circuit Court, case number 67CV-21-69 filed by George TBR, Inc., F&T Transport Corp, Ahmad Jaber, MNN Development, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G)(mll)
November 12, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/15/2021.(mll)
November 12, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2494272.. (Watts, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Jaber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Edwards
Represented By: Jay T. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmad Jaber
Represented By: Richard N. Watts
Represented By: Taylor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F&T Transport Corp
Represented By: Richard N. Watts
Represented By: Taylor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNN Development, Inc.
Represented By: Richard N. Watts
Represented By: Taylor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George TBR, Inc.
Represented By: Richard N. Watts
Represented By: Taylor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?