Russell v. King
Plaintiff: Eric Demond Russell
Defendant: Nurse King and Nurse S. King
Case Number: 4:2022cv04020
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Supplement #6 Amended Complaint by Eric Demond Russell. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to S. King and USM285 form delivered to USMS for defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #6 Amended Complaint, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #7 Order Directing Service.(mll)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE S. King and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 8, 2022. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against S. King filed by Eric Demond Russell.(mll)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Miller County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $7.87; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (cnn)
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00; ORDER DIRECTING that a/an Amended Complaint be filed.( Amended Complaint due by 3/18/2022). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 25, 2022. (cnn)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Eric Demond Russell. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(cnn)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Nurse King, filed by Eric Demond Russell.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Demond Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?