Adams v. TDC General Contractors LLC
Plaintiff: Reuben L. Adams
Defendant: TDC General Contractors LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv04110
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by TDC General Contractors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Carroll, James)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TDC General Contractors LLC. (Keil, D.)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by TDC General Contractors LLC.(Keil, D.)
December 8, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Reuben L. Adams. TDC General Contractors LLC was sent waiver on 11/10/2022, answer due 1/9/2023. (Tann, Joseph)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT by Plaintiff against Defendant against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2685452), filed by Reuben L. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tann, Joseph)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Reuben L. Adams. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3).(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. TDC General Contractors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben L. Adams
Represented By: Joseph S Tann, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDC General Contractors LLC
Represented By: D. Matt Keil
Represented By: James Raymond Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?