Woods v. Singleton et al
Plaintiff: Earl Spencer Woods, Jr
Defendant: James Singleton, Captain James Wise, Officer Elkins, Bryant, Elkin, Sheriff James Singleton, Jail Doctor Elkins and Jail Guard Bryant
Case Number: 4:2023cv04080
Filed: August 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Texarkana Office
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
2 Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Elkin, James Wise, James Singleton, Bryant filed by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. Related document: #2 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr.(mll)
September 28, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Having reviewed Plaintiff's Motion, (ECF No. 13), the Court finds that the extension has been requested in good faith and is warranted. Amended Complaint due by 10/30/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on September 28, 2023. (ksb)
September 27, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(mll)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as premature #8 Motion for Discovery, and #9 MOTION for Booking Sheet; DIRECTING the Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by October 4, 2023. Further, the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove Doctor from Defendant Elkins title and correct the spelling of his name to "Elkin". (See Order for Specifics) Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on September 13, 2023. (lgd)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC North Central Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account filing fee of $350; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Warden, ADC North Central Unit, AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office). (lgd) Modified text on 9/18/2023 (lgd).
September 13, 2023 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983), and finding as moot #1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on September 13, 2023. (ksb)
September 8, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Booking Sheet by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(mll)
September 8, 2023 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(hnc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION of Discovery by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
August 25, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. With his complaint, Plaintiff submitted an in forma pauperis (IFP) application. However, the application is incomplete because Plaintiff only submitted the funds certificate but no application. For this reason, the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Prisoner IFP application. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this Order to either return the completed application to this court for review and filing or pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee and 52.00 dollar administrative fee, a total of 402.00 dollars. This case shall be subject to dismissal for failure to obey an order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to return the completed IFP application or pay the 402.00 dollar filing fee by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 9/15/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on August 25, 2023. (awl)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
August 23, 2023 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:23-cv-00775. Docket sheet received.
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case immediately to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 8/23/2023. (jbh)
August 23, 2023 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) transferred in from Eastern District of Arkansas.(mll)
August 23, 2023 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) filed by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A Bryant.(mll)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. directing the Clerk of Court to transfer this case immediately to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 8/23/2023. (jbh)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bryant, Elkins, James Singleton, James Wise filed by Earl Spencer Woods, Jr. (ldb) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Singleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Spencer Woods, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain James Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff James Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Doctor Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Guard Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?