Johnson v. Activision Blizzard, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Preston Johnson and Elizabeth Jones
Defendant: Elizabeth Johnson, Activision Blizzard, Inc., Infinity Ward, Inc., Treyarch Corp., Sledgehammer Games, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Epic Games, Inc., Roblox Corp, Mojang Studios, XBOX Game Studios, Rockstar Games, Inc., Rockstar North Limited, War Drum Studios LLC doing business as Grove Street Games, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. and Jane & John Doe 1-XX
Case Number: 4:2023cv04107
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party, War Drum Studios LLC d/b/a Grove Street Games, by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones . (Walas, Breean)
December 20, 2023 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Roblox Corp was sent waiver on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 20, 2023 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. War Drum Studios LLC was sent waiver on 12/19/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 18, 2023 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. XBOX Game Studios was sent waiver on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 18, 2023 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Mojang Studios was sent waiver on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 18, 2023 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Microsoft Corporation was sent waiver on 12/12/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 14, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Treyarch Corp. was sent waiver on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 14, 2023 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Sledgehammer Games, Inc. was sent waiver on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Infinity Ward, Inc. was sent waiver on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 14, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Activision Blizzard, Inc. was sent waiver on 12/14/2023, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Bullock on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Bullock, Tina)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Ward Mason on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mason, Danielle)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Breean Walas on behalf of Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. (Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Breean Walas on behalf of Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. (Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. was sent waiver on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Rockstar Games, Inc. was sent waiver on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Rockstar North Limited was sent waiver on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Walas, Breean)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Rockstar Games, Inc. on December 6, 2023 by All Plaintiffs. Waiver of Service due by 2/5/2024. (Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Rockstar Games UK Ltd. on December 6, 2023 by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. Waiver of Service due by 2/5/2024. (Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Tina Bullock is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 6, 2023. (hnd)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Danielle Ward Mason is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 6, 2023. (hnd)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Tina Bullock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2887202) by Elizabeth Jones, Preston Johnson. (Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Danielle Ward Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2887183) by Elizabeth Jones, Preston Johnson. (Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Activision Blizzard, Inc., Epic Games, Inc., Roblox Corp, Rockstar Games, Inc., Sledgehammer Games, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Treyarch Corp., War Drum Studios LLC, XBOX Game Studios and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service.(mll)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Waiver by Elizabeth Jones of service of summons. (Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
November 14, 2023 Complaint fee received: $402.00, receipt number AARWDC-2874774.(mll)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Preston Johnson, Elizabeth Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Walas, Breean) Modified on 12/7/2023.(mll)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Elizabeth Johnson, Preston Johnson. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3).(mll)
November 8, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/13/2023.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Activision Blizzard, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Johnson
Represented By: Breean Walas
Represented By: Danielle Ward Mason
Represented By: Tina Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Jones
Represented By: Danielle Ward Mason
Represented By: Breean Walas
Represented By: Tina Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: Breean Walas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Ward, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treyarch Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sledgehammer Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roblox Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojang Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XBOX Game Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockstar Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockstar North Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: War Drum Studios LLC doing business as Grove Street Games
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane & John Doe 1-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?