Smith v. Tallant et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr
Defendant: Jana Tallant and Chief Deputy Joey Davis
Case Number: 4:2023cv04111
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
2 Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joey Davis, Jana Tallant filed by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr.(mll)
January 10, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr.(mll)
December 19, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to submit amended complaint by December 18, 2023. (ECF No. 3). This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 1/9/2024. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on December 19, 2023. (awl)
December 5, 2023 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Howard County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (cc: Sheriff, Howard County)(mll)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00; ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. (Amended Complaint due by 12/18/2023.) Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on November 27, 2023.(mll)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Joey Davis, Jana Tallant filed by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Tallant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Tallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy Joey Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?