Smith v. Tallant et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr and Curtis Wayne Smith, Jr.
Defendant: Jail Administrator Jana Tallant, John or Jane Doe Administrative Staff, Jailer Landon Tollette, Jailer Jordan Niel and Jailer Rebecca Castleman
Case Number: 4:2024cv04020
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2024 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #6 Amended Complaint filed by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 5/3/2024. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 16, 2024.(mll)
March 6, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rebecca Castleman, Landon Tollette, John or Jane Doe Administrative Staff, Jana Tallant, Jordan Niel filed by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr.(mll)
February 27, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing ADC - North Central Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction, Warden, ADC - North Central Unit)(mll)
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $350.00; ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. (Amended Complaint due by 3/19/2024.) Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 27, 2024.(mll)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Rebecca Castleman, John or Jane Doe Administrative Staff, Jordan Niel, Jana Tallant, Landon Tollette filed by Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Tallant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Wayne Dale Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Wayne Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Administrator Jana Tallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe Administrative Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Landon Tollette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Jordan Niel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Rebecca Castleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?