Ybarra v. State of Arkansas
Petitioner: Amber Ybarra
Respondent: State of Arkansas
Case Number: 4:2024cv04026
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Brooke Jackson-Gasaway on behalf of State of Arkansas. (Jackson-Gasaway, Pamela)
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by State of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A- Sentencing Order, #3 Exhibit B- Plea Statement, #4 Exhibit C- Probable Cause Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D- Docket, #6 Exhibit E- Court Connect Docket)(Jackson-Gasaway, Pamela)
April 15, 2024 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order Directing Pleading to be Filed. Office of the Attorney General received documents on 4/5/24.(mll)
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF SERVICE: CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT RECEIVED for service of documents as set forth in #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Dexter Payne - ADC received documents on 4/5/24.(mll)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING that a Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be filed by 5/4/2024. Petitioner is directed to file no additional pleadings until after the Response is filed. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 3, 2024.(mll) Modified on 4/4/2024 to correct deadline and text (mjm).
April 3, 2024 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order Directing Pleading to be Filed, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Dexter Payne - ADC using Certified Mail Article number 9589 0710 5270 0988 5223 86.(mll)
April 3, 2024 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order Directing Pleading to be Filed, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus as to Tim Griffin - Office of Attorney General using Certified Mail Article number 9589 0710 5270 0988 5223 79.(mll)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amber Ybarra. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Amber Ybarra.(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ybarra v. State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amber Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Pamela Brooke Jackson-Gasaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?