Yeoman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2005cv05151
Filed: August 29, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER/JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees and adopting Magistrate's recommendation. Fees awarded to Patricia Yeoman against Social Security Administration. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 13, 2007. (tg)
August 20, 2007 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Patricia S. Yeoman. Objections to R&R due by 9/6/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on August 20, 2007. (tg)
June 29, 2007 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 19, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant per motion for attorney fees. (jn)
June 19, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Patricia S. Yeoman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index# 2 Affidavit Plaintiff# 3 Affidavit Counsel# 4 Exhibit "A" time before court & SSA# 5 Exhibit "A-1" time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
June 19, 2007 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Patricia S. Yeoman. (Spencer, Frederick)
March 23, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on March 23, 2007. (cc: OHA & ALJ)(jn)
January 27, 2006 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Patricia S. Yeoman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Spencer, Frederick)
January 9, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 9, 2005 7 Featured Case ORDER limiting appeal briefs to maximum of 20 pages. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on December 9, 2005. (bak)
December 9, 2005 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
December 5, 2005 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/4/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/3/2006. (mfr)
December 5, 2005 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
October 27, 2005 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on October 27, 2005. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent # 2 Exhibit USA Consent)(bak)
September 15, 2005 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Case referral reassigned to Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (mfr)
August 29, 2005 3 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's application to proceed IFP and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 8/25/05. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 26, 2005. (jn)
August 29, 2005 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Patricia S. Yeoman. (jn)
August 29, 2005 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
August 29, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Patricia S. Yeoman. Referred to Magistrate Beverly S. Jones. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/25/05 (jn) Modified on 8/29/2005 to add text (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeoman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?