Fite v. SSA

Case Number: 5:2005cv05158
Filed: September 12, 2005
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2006 9 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and affirming the decision of the commissioner and dismissing complaint with prejudice re 8 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 5, 2006. (tg)
August 16, 2006 Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (ct)
August 14, 2006 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Michael Fite, Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 8/14/06. (ct)
January 20, 2006 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by SSA. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 14, 2005 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief.. (tg)
December 6, 2005 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by SSA. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/5/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/4/2006. (mfr)
December 6, 2005 5 ANSWER to Complaint by SSA.(Webb, Mark)
October 4, 2005 4 Summons Issued as to SSA, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and SSA General Counsel and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (tg)
September 12, 2005 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of September 6, 2005.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 08, 2005. (tg)
September 12, 2005 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Fite. (tg)
September 12, 2005 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Fite. (tg)
September 12, 2005 1 COMPLAINT against SSA to be filed nunc pro tunc as of September 6, 2005, filed by Michael Fite.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fite v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?