Eaton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05004
Filed: January 11, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $2,346.25. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2007. (jn) Modified on 2/16/2007 to correct signature date (jn).
January 5, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
January 4, 2007 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 19, 2006 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Scotty Eaton. (Odom, Conrad)
December 19, 2006 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Scotty Eaton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Itemization of Services# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Consumer Price Index)(Odom, Conrad)
September 21, 2006 11 JUDGMENT reversing decision of commissioner and remanding for further consideration. ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/21/06. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
September 21, 2006 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/21/06. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
May 9, 2006 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 7, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Scotty Eaton. (Odom, Conrad)
March 9, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck, )
March 8, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/7/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/8/2006. (rw )
March 8, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 30, 2006 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on January 30, 2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; #(2) Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
January 12, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney for service (ct)
January 11, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER directing that 1 Complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of December 6, 2005, and that 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis be granted. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 1/9/06. (ct)
January 11, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT of Scotty Eaton filed by plaintiff in support of 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
January 11, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scotty Eaton. (ct)
January 11, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Scotty Eaton. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 12/6/05(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?