Keith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05019
Filed: February 1, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 16 and granting 11 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Dorothea B. Keith. . Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 3/7/07. (ct)
February 16, 2007 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Dorothea B. Keith. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 16, 2007. (jn)
January 23, 2007 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 14 Reply to Response to Motion by Dorothea B. Keith. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 23, 2007 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Dorothea B. Keith. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 11, 2007 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 8, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for ruling on motion for attorney fees. (ct)
January 5, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees.. (ct)
January 4, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Dorothea B. Keith. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 4, 2007 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Dorothea B. Keith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgement# 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing# 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
November 7, 2006 10 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 9 ; Reversing decision of the Commissioner and remanding case. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 11/7/06. cc w/copy of R&R to ALJ & OHA(ct)
October 16, 2006 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Dorothea B. Keith, Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 10/16/06. (ct)
August 16, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Dorothea B. Keith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Award# 2 Exhibit B Electronic Application Form# 3 Exhibit C Two DOT Job Descriptions)(Cazort, Mildred)
June 16, 2006 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 26, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
April 24, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SUPPLEMENTAL SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
April 24, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/24/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/23/2006. (mfr)
April 24, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 10, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
February 1, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Dorothea B. Keith, 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dorothea B. Keith. The court grants motion to proceed IFP and directs the clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of January 27, 2006.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 1/31/06. (ct)
February 1, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT of Dorothea B. Keith filed by Dorothea B. Keith re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
February 1, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dorothea B. Keith. (ct)
February 1, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Dorothea B. Keith. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of January 27, 2006(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?