Bragg v. Social Security Administration

Case Number: 5:2006cv05020
Filed: February 1, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2007 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 9, 2007. (tg)
February 7, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to the case. (sh)
September 19, 2006 17 AMENDED JUDGMENT remanding case to Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42:405(g). Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on September 19, 2006. (cc: OHA & ALJ)(jn)
September 19, 2006 16 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on September 19, 2006. (jn)
September 5, 2006 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 22, 2006 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 22, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Exhibit Commissioner's Consent) [Document re-docketed to add attached consents](bak)
August 22, 2006 13 ***DISREGARD ENTRY; RE-FILED TO ATTACH EXHIBITS***CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 22, 2006. (bak) Modified on 8/23/2006 to show re-filing (jn).
August 21, 2006 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Shelly Bragg. (Cazort, Mildred)
August 21, 2006 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Shelly Bragg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgement# 2 Exhibit B EAJA Statement# 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index Chart)(Cazort, Mildred)
August 1, 2006 10 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four, 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on August 1, 2006. cc: ALJ, OHA(tg)
August 1, 2006 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on August 1, 2006. (tg)
June 21, 2006 8 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 28, 2006 7 Featured Case ORDER limiting appeal briefs to a maximum of 20 pages. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on April 28, 2006. (bak)
April 28, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
April 26, 2006 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
April 24, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/24/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/23/2006. (mfr)
April 24, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 10, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
March 8, 2006 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bobby E. Shepherd. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
February 1, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of January 27, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on January 31, 2006. (tg)
February 1, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT of Shelly Bragg re 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (tg)
February 1, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Shelly Bragg. (tg) Additional attachment added on 2/1/2006 (replaced motion, original had wrong file date (msj).
February 1, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Shelly Bragg. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 1/27/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg) Additional attachment added on 2/1/2006 (replaced complaint, original complaint had wrong filemark date(msj). Modified on 2/3/2006 to add text (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bragg v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?