Spielman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05063
Filed: April 10, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2008 21 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Brian Spielman against Social Security Administration Commissioner; adopting 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Acess to Justice Act filed by Brian Spielman. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 18, 2008. (ct)
December 18, 2007 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Acess to Justice Act filed by Brian Spielman. Objections to R&R due by 1/7/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 18, 2007. (tg)
December 12, 2007 19 RESPONSE to Motion re 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Acess to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 30, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
November 28, 2007 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Request for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act. by Brian Spielman. (Brooks, Evelyn)
November 28, 2007 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Acess to Justice Act by Brian Spielman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A(1)-Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A(2)-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
September 26, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY, adopting Report and Recommendation and reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 26, 2007. cc: ALJ & OH&A (tg) Modified on 9/26/2007 to add cc (tg).
September 7, 2007 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Brian Spielman. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 7, 2007. (tg)
February 5, 2007 14 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 9, 2007 13 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Brian Spielman. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 13, 2006 12 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/13/2006. (cla)
December 13, 2006 11 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
December 11, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/10/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/9/2007. (mfr)
December 11, 2006 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 22, 2006 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Brian Spielman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Letter to Regional Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
November 21, 2006 8 AFFIDAVIT filed by Brian Spielman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
November 10, 2006 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Brian Spielman. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/17/2006, answer due 11/6/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Letter of Service# 2 Exhibit B Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
October 16, 2006 6 Featured Case ORDER granting an additional 60 days to perfect service and file service with this Court. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on October 16, 2006. (jn)
October 13, 2006 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Brian Spielman. (Brooks, Evelyn)
October 12, 2006 4 CLERK'S ORDER re Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff given 10 days to show cause why service not perfected. (rw)
April 10, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
April 10, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Brian Spielman and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of April 4, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on April 7, 2006. (tg)
April 10, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Brian Spielman. (tg)
April 10, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of April 4, 2006 filed by Brian Spielman.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spielman v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?