Holt v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05069
Filed: April 19, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2007 14 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Donald Holt against defendant in the amount of $2737.26. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 13, 2007. (jn)
August 10, 2007 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 7, 2007 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Donald Holt. (Odom, Conrad)
August 7, 2007 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Donald Holt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Itemization of Services# 2 Exhibit B - Consumer Price Index)(Odom, Conrad) Modified on 8/9/2007 to edit text (cap).
May 9, 2007 10 JUDGMENT reversing decision of Commissioner and remanding case for further consideration.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/9/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
May 9, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/9/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
August 28, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 14, 2006 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Donald Holt. (Odom, Conrad)
July 20, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
July 14, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/14/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/12/2006. (mfr)
July 14, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 2, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 2, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
April 19, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
April 19, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 4/10/06. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 4/18/06. (ct) Modified on 4/20/2006 to correct nunc pro tunc date (jn).
April 19, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Holt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Financial Status)(ct)
April 19, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Donald Holt. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 4/10/06(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?