Hill v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05074
Filed: April 26, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2007 19 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Plaintiff against defendant in amount of $2,914.47. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 18, 2007. (ct)
May 1, 2007 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Ruth Hill, Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/1/07. (ct)
April 19, 2007 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order in Jones Case)(Hawkins, Claude)
April 18, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. (ct)
April 17, 2007 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Ruth Hill. (Cazort, Mildred)
April 17, 2007 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Ruth Hill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgement# 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing Statement# 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
April 10, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 reversing the decision of the ALJ and remands to Commissioner for reconsideration pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 4/10/07. cc w/copy of R&R: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
March 9, 2007 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Ruth Hill; Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/907. (ct)
February 7, 2007 12 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner to 8 Appeal Brief (Social Security-Government). (Hawkins, Claude)
January 31, 2007 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Ruth Hill. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 24, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue; Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2007.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 1/24/07. (ct)
January 22, 2007 9 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by Ruth Hill. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
September 5, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 20, 2006 7 AMENDED SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (ct)
July 20, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
July 14, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/14/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/12/2006. (mfr)
July 14, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
May 9, 2006 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
April 26, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of April 21, 2006. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 4/25/06. (ct)
April 26, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT by Ruth Hill filed by Ruth Hill in support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
April 26, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ruth Hill. (ct)
April 26, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Ruth Hill. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/21/06 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?