Clark v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05077
Filed: May 1, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2007 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Attorney Fees 19 in amount of $3,596.31 Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 4/24/07. (ct)
April 22, 2007 19 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees under Equal Access to Justice Act by Carla Faith Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit by Plaintiff's Attorney supporting Supplement Request for for Fees and Costs# 2 Exhibit Supplemental Itemized Time and Costs)(Croxton, Hardy)
April 22, 2007 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA filed by Carla Faith Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attorney's Affidavit Supporting Reply to Defendant Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for EAJA Attorney's Fees)(Croxton, Hardy)
April 18, 2007 Case re-referred in error. Judge Marchewski is presiding judge in this case. Modified on 4/18/2007 (ct).
April 18, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski for ruling on motion for attorney fees. (ct)
April 17, 2007 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 11, 2007 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA AND FOR COSTS by Carla Faith Clark. (Croxton, Hardy)
April 11, 2007 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA by Carla Faith Clark. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(Croxton, Hardy)
March 7, 2007 14 JUDGMENT reversing Commissioner's decision and remanding for further consideration. ***Civil Case Terminated***. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/7/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
March 7, 2007 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/7/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (jrs)
October 10, 2006 12 REPLY by Carla Faith Clark re 11 Appeal Brief (Social Security-Government) REPLY TO DEFENDANTS APPEAL BRIEF. (Croxton, Hardy)
September 5, 2006 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 10, 2006 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Carla Faith Clark. (Croxton, Hardy)
August 10, 2006 9 ***NO SIGNATURE ON PLEADING - REFILED AS DOUCMENT 10) APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Carla Faith Clark. (Croxton, Hardy) Modified on 8/14/2006 to note document refiled (cap).
July 13, 2006 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on July 13, 2006. (jck)
July 13, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
July 11, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/10/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/11/2006. (mfr)
July 11, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 2, 2006 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on June 2, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
May 1, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorneyfor service (ct)
May 1, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Carla Faith Clark, 3 and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 4/24/06 . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 4/24/06. (ct)
May 1, 2006 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Carla Faith Clark. Filed nunc pro tunc as of April 24, 2006. Complaint re-filed to attach exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of appeals council action# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Decision)(ct)
May 1, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Carla Faith Clark. (ct)
May 1, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner; file nunc pro tunc as of 4/24/06 filed by Carla Faith Clark.(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?