Burns v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05087
Filed: May 12, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2007 12 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 Amended Report and Recommendations and 10 Report and Recommendations, affirming commissioner's decision & dismissing with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 5/10/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/R&RS(ct)
April 16, 2007 11 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jimmie E. Burns. Objections to R&R due by 5/3/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on April 16, 2007. (tg)
April 12, 2007 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jimmie E. Burns, Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 4/12/07. (ct)
February 27, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 8 Motion to Continue. Appellant Brief filed 2/5/07, Document #9, is deemed timely filed . Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 2/27/07. (cap)
February 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. (tg)
February 5, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jimmie E. Burns. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I DOT# 2 Exhibit I-A DOT)(Cazort, Mildred)
January 22, 2007 8 First MOTION to Continue time to filing brief by Jimmie E. Burns. (Cazort, Mildred)
October 23, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd no longer assigned to case. (jrs)
September 29, 2006 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 27, 2006 TEXT ONLY Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Bobby E. Shepherd on July 27, 2006. (bak)
July 27, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (bak)
July 26, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/25/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/25/2006. (mfr)
July 26, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 7, 2006 Judge Bobby E. Shepherd added. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to case. (jn)
May 16, 2006 Four Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
May 12, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 5/8/06. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 5/10/06. (ct)
May 12, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT of Jimmie E. Burns filed by Jimmie E. Burns re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
May 12, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie E. Burns. (ct)
May 12, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Jimmie E. Burns. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/8/06 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct) Modified on 5/16/2006 to add nunc pro tunc text (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?