Kinney v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05101
Filed: June 6, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 Report and Recommendations, ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on May 30, 2007. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/R&R(tg)
April 30, 2007 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by David W Kinney. Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on April 30, 2007. (tg)
March 31, 2007 13 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by David W Kinney. (Cazort, Mildred)
March 27, 2007 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion to Continue. Appellant Brief due by 3/31/2007.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on March 27, 2007. (tg)
March 23, 2007 11 Second MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by David W Kinney. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 24, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue. Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on January 24, 2007. (tg)
January 22, 2007 9 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by David W Kinney. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
October 31, 2006 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 21, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 21, 2006. (jck)
August 21, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
August 18, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/18/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/17/2006. (rw)
August 18, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 20, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
June 6, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 5/31/06 and granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on June 2, 2006. (tg)
June 6, 2006 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David W Kinney. (tg)
June 6, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David W Kinney. (tg)
June 6, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by David W Kinney. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/31/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?