Spears v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05159
Filed: August 28, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2007 13 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 affirming decision of ALJ and dismisses complaint with prejudice cc: ALJ & OH&A. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 23, 2007. (ct)
August 3, 2007 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Dickie Spears. Objections to R&R due by 8/20/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 3, 2007. (jn)
March 1, 2007 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Dickie Spears. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 24, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue; Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2007.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 1/24/07. (ct)
January 22, 2007 9 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by Dickie Spears. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 19, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
November 27, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 11/27/2006. (cla)
November 27, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
November 21, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/21/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/22/2007. (mfr)
November 21, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
September 11, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
August 28, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 8/22/06 and granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 8/28/06. (ct)
August 28, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT of Dickie Spears filed by Dickie Spears re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
August 28, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dickie Spears. (ct)
August 28, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Dickie Spears. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 8/22/06 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?