Berg v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05166
Filed: September 8, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER 14 on Motion to Reopen Case, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on October 4, 2007. (ct)
August 23, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Reopen Case for the limited purpose of allowing plaintiff to file objections to the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 23, 2007. (tg)
August 17, 2007 13 MOTION to Reopen Case by Raymond L. Berg. (ct)
August 7, 2007 12 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 11 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 7, 2007. cc to ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct) Modified on 8/7/2007 to add docket text(ct).
July 20, 2007 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Raymond L. Berg, Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 20, 2007. (ct)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 13, 2006 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Raymond L. Berg. (jn)
December 6, 2006 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 15, 2006 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 11/15/2006. (cla)
November 15, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
November 14, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/14/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/15/2007. (rw)
November 14, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 3, 2006 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of complaint, filed by Clerk on behalf of Raymond L. Berg. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/21/2006, answer due 11/20/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit; Return receipts)(jn)
September 19, 2006 Remark : Complaint, Application to proceed IFP, Order granting IFP and Order Directing Service mailed to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General by certified mail, returned receipt requested. (jn)
September 19, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by clerk, certified mail, on Social Security Administration Commissioner and granting 60 days to answer. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 19, 2006. (jn)
September 8, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER allowing plaintiff to proceed IFP and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 8/31/06. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 5, 2006. (jn)
September 8, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Raymond L. Berg. (jn)
September 8, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Raymond L. Berg. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/31/06.(jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?