Vallely v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05184
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2007 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant, nunc pro tunc as of May 4, 2007. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 5/21/07. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
May 4, 2007 17 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO Commissioner pursuant to sentence four; granting 15 Unopposed MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/4/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
May 4, 2007 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 5/4/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
May 2, 2007 15 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 26, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/23/2007 per order 4/23/07. (ct)
April 23, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time for defendant to File Appeal Brief until 5/23/07 . Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 4/23/07. (ct) Modified on 4/26/2007 (ct) to correct date of Judge's signature.
April 20, 2007 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 23, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Robert S. Vallely. (Cazort, Mildred)
March 20, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and allowing plaintiff an extension of 30 pages. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 3/20/07. (ct)
March 13, 2007 10 First MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for SSA Appeal Brief by Robert S. Vallely. (Cazort, Mildred)
March 6, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referred to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jrs)
January 24, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Continue; Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 1/24/07. (ct)
January 22, 2007 8 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by Robert S. Vallely. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 11, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/11/2006. (cla)
December 11, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
December 8, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT (2 volumes) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/8/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/6/2007. (mfr)
December 8, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 11, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
September 29, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 9/25/06. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/27/06. (ct)
September 29, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Vallerly filed by Robert S. Vallely re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
September 29, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert S. Vallely. (ct)
September 29, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Robert S. Vallely. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/25/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vallely v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?