Mount v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05185
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2008 23 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Edward Earl Mount against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 8, 2008. (tg)
December 3, 2007 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Edward Earl Mount Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2007. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 3, 2007. (tg)
December 3, 2007 21 ***DISREGARD WRONG EVENT USED*** MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 3, 2007. (tg) Modified on 12/4/2007 (tg).
November 29, 2007 20 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 19, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
November 16, 2007 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 18 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Edward Earl Mount. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 16, 2007 18 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Edward Earl Mount. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Bill, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
September 26, 2007 17 Featured Case JUDGMENT/ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY, adopting Report and Recommendation and reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 26, 2007. cc: ALJ & OH&A(tg)
August 27, 2007 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Edward Earl Mount. Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 27, 2007. (tg)
April 25, 2007 15 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 24, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on April 24, 2007. (tg)
April 23, 2007 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 23, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Edward Earl Mount. (Cazort, Mildred)
March 16, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and allowing plaintiff two additional pages. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/16/07. (ct)
March 13, 2007 10 First MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for SSA Appeal Brief by Edward Earl Mount. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 24, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Continue. Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on January 24, 2007. (tg)
January 22, 2007 8 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by Edward Earl Mount. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 11, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/11/2006. (cla)
December 11, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
December 8, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/8/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/6/2007. (mfr)
December 8, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 11, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
September 29, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER directing that the 1 Complaint filed by Edward Earl Mount, be entered nunc pro tunc as of 9/25/06 and 2 Application to proceed ifp, filed by Edward Earl Mount, be granted. . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/27/06. (ct)
September 29, 2006 3 AFFIDAVIT of Edward Earl Mount filed by Edward Earl Mount re 2 Application to proceed ifp. (ct)
September 29, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Edward Earl Mount. (ct)
September 29, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Edward Earl Mount. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/25/06. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mount v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?