Morris v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05213
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2008 16 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Carletta M. Morris against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 23, 2007. (tg)
January 4, 2008 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Carletta M. Morris Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 4, 2008. (ct)
December 28, 2007 14 RESPONSE to Motion re 12 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 14, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
December 13, 2007 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 12 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Carletta M. Morris. (Cazort, Mildred)
December 13, 2007 12 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Carletta M. Morris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Judgment, # 2 Exhibit EAJA Bill, # 3 Exhibit CPI)(Cazort, Mildred)
November 30, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remands this case for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 30, 2007. cc: ALJ & OHA(tg)
October 23, 2007 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Carletta M. Morris, Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 23, 2007. (ct)
April 4, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 5, 2007 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 02/05/2007. (cla)
February 5, 2007 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
February 2, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/5/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/3/2007. (sh)
February 2, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 4, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
November 9, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carletta M. Morris and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of November 6, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on November 7, 2006. (tg)
November 9, 2006 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carletta M. Morris. (tg)
November 9, 2006 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carletta M. Morris. (tg)
November 9, 2006 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Carletta M. Morris. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action) RE-FILED TO ADD PDF(tg)
November 9, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Carletta M. Morris.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?