Perkins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05215
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2008 20 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees, in favor of April Perkins against Social Security Administration Commissioner, Motions terminated: 19 MOTION for Reconsideration re 18 Judgment on Attorney Fees filed by April Perkins.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 18, 2008. (ct)
January 16, 2008 19 MOTION for Reconsideration re 18 Judgment on Attorney Fees by April Perkins. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 11, 2008 18 AMENDED JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of April Perkins against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 11, 2008. (tg)
January 7, 2008 17 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of April Perkins against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 7, 2008. (tg)
January 3, 2008 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Acess to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 21, 2007 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by April Perkins. (Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 12/26/2007 to link to document 13 (msj).
December 21, 2007 14 ***DISREGARD ENTRY-INCORRECT EVENT USED- WILL REFILE*** REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Acess to Justice Act filed by April Perkins. (Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 12/21/2007 to show re-filing.(jn).
December 21, 2007 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Acess to Justice Act by April Perkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1-Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A-2-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 12/26/2007 to correct spelling error(tg).
October 4, 2007 12 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 4, 2007. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/MO(tg)
October 4, 2007 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 4, 2007. (tg)
March 13, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 12, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by April Perkins. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 16, 2007 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 01/16/2007. (cla)
January 16, 2007 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
January 12, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/12/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/13/2007. (mfr)
January 12, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
January 3, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 1/19/2007. (cap)
December 29, 2006 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by April Perkins. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/20/2006, answer due 1/19/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to the Regional Chief# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 1/3/2007 to correct date served and answer due date (cap).
November 21, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on November 21, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
November 9, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by April Perkins and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of November 6, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on November 7, 2006. (tg)
November 9, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff April Perkins. (tg)
November 9, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
November 9, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by April Perkins.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?