Breedlove v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Craig A. Breedlove
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05039
Filed: March 5, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/4/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/3/2007. (mfr)
June 1, 2007 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
April 27, 2007 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Craig A. Breedlove served on 4/4/2007, answer due 6/4/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
April 11, 2007 8 Letter from U S District Clerk with copy of Transfer Order and docket sheet attached sent to Eastern District of Arkansas (ct)
April 11, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of Arkansas. Letter, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (File retained for appeal time to run), Motions terminated: 6 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Craig A. Breedlove. ***Civil Case Terminated***. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 4/11/07. (ct)
April 6, 2007 6 MOTION to Change Venue by Craig A. Breedlove. (Brooks, Evelyn)
April 3, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on March 30, 2007. (tg)
March 27, 2007 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Craig A. Breedlove. (ct)
March 5, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER directing that 1 Complaint be provisionally filed prior to deterimation regarding plaintiff's status as a pauper. Clerk directed to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 2/26/07 and to return the ifp form, without filing, for completion and return by 4/2/07.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 3/1/07. (ct)
March 5, 2007 2 ***DISREGARD-FILED IN ERROR*** APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Craig A. Breedlove. (ct) Modified on 3/5/2007 to disregard; ifp application incomplete (cnn).
March 5, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Craig A. Breedlove.(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breedlove v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig A. Breedlove
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?