Sims et al v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Charles Ray Sims and Pamela Sims
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods South Dakota Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation and Menu Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv05053
Filed: March 21, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2007 26
Transmittal of Documents to U.S. District Court, District of NJ: Certified copy of docket sheet, MDL Transfer Order with letter as requested by Clerk, District of NJ. (tg)
June 8, 2007 23
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc., Menu Foods, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
June 4, 2007 22
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by all plaintiffs of Summons and Complaint on Menu Foods Income Fund (Hatfield, Jason)
May 14, 2007 19
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc., Menu Foods, Inc..(Comstock, Christy)
May 7, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment, granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. answer due 5/14/2007; Menu Foods Midwest Corporation answer due 5/14/2007; Menu Foods South Dakota Inc. answer due 5/14/2007; Menu Foods, Inc. answer due 5/14/2007. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on May 7, 2007. (tg)
May 3, 2007 16
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc., Menu Foods Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., 15 Memorandum Brief in Support by Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc., Menu Foods, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
May 2, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 7 Motion to Stay litigation. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on May 2, 2007. (tg)
April 24, 2007 12
NOTICE of Appearance by Christy Comstock on behalf of Menu Foods Income Fund (Comstock, Christy)
April 18, 2007 10
RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Stay filed by Charles Ray Sims, Pamela Sims. (Hatfield, Jason)
April 12, 2007 8
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion to Stay by Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
April 4, 2007 6
SUMMONS Returned Executed by all plaintiffs. Menu Foods, Inc. served on 3/23/2007, answer due 4/12/2007. (Hatfield, Jason)
March 21, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota Inc., Menu Foods, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 5000049.), filed by Charles Ray Sims, Pamela Sims.(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims et al v. Menu Foods Income Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ray Sims
Represented By: Jason M. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Sims
Represented By: Jason M. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?