Calder v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Billy Calder
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05063
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2008 11 JUDGMENT/ORDER affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing plaintiff's case with prejudice ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 15, 2008. (tg)
January 15, 2008 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 15, 2008. (tg)
August 1, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 16, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SUPPLEMENTAL SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
July 16, 2007 8 NOTICE by Social Security Administration Commissioner re Social Security Transcript, (Hawkins, Claude)
July 3, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Billy Calder. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 5, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 06/05/2007. (cla)
June 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/4/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/3/2007. (mfr)
June 1, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
May 8, 2007 Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 6/18/2007. (jn)
May 4, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Billy Calder served on 4/18/2007, answer due 6/18/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certfied Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 5/8/2007 to correct service and answer date (jn).
April 12, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on April 12, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
April 6, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
April 6, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Billy Calder and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of April 2, 2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on April 4, 2007. (tg)
April 6, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Billy Calder. (tg)
April 6, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Billy Calder to be filed nunc pro tunc as of April 2, 2007. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calder v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Calder
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?