Allison v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Michael Allison
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05082
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2008 15 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees, in favor of Michael Allison against Social Security Administration Commissioner; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 14 ; granting motion 11 for Attorney Fees EAJA FEE Attorney filed by Michael Allison. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 2, 2008. (ct)
June 4, 2008 14 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA FEE Attorney filed by Michael Allison. Objections to R&R due by 6/23/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 4, 2008. (ct)
May 27, 2008 13 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA FEE Attorney filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 19, 2008 Featured Case CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
May 17, 2008 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA FEE Attorney by Michael Allison. (Cazort, Mildred)
May 17, 2008 11 Featured Case First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA FEE Attorney by Michael Allison. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B EAJA Bill, # 2 Exhibit C Comsumer Price Index, # 3 Exhibit A Judgment)(Cazort, Mildred)
February 7, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 7, 2008. cc: ALJ & OHA w/R&R (tg) Modified on 2/8/2008 to add text (tg).
January 16, 2008 9 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Michael Allison Objections to R&R due by 2/4/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 16, 2008. (ct)
August 30, 2007 8 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 6, 2007 7 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Michael Allison. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A DOT Assembler, Production)(Cazort, Mildred)
July 3, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 07/03/2007. (caz)
July 2, 2007 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/1/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/31/2007. (mfr)
July 2, 2007 6 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
May 11, 2007 Featured Case Summons (4) Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
May 7, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint and 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Allison. granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Allison and directing that the complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/30/07.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/2/07. (ct)
May 7, 2007 4 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Michael Allison filed by Michael Allison re 3 Affidavit. REDOCKETED TO ATTACH ENTIRE DOCUMENT, PAGE 2 MISSING ON PREVIOUS DOCKET ENTRY. (ct)
May 7, 2007 3 Featured Case ***DISREGARD ENTRY: REFILED TO CORRECT PDF***AFFIDAVIT of Michael Allison filed by Michael Allison re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct) Modified on 5/9/2007 to show refiling(jn).
May 7, 2007 2 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Allison. (ct)
May 7, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Michael Allison. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/30/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allison v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Allison
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?