Hoff v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Rebecca Sue Hoff
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05083
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2008 14 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and granting Motion for Attorney Fees in favor of Rebecca Sue Hoff against Social Security Administration Commissioner in the amount of $1589.37. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 16, 2008. (jn)
June 23, 2008 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Rebecca Sue Hoff. Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 23, 2008. (ct)
June 19, 2008 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 4, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
June 4, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Rebecca Sue Hoff. (Cazort, Mildred)
June 4, 2008 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Rebecca Sue Hoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing Statement)(Cazort, Mildred)
March 19, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY, adopting Report and Recommendation and reversing the decision of the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 19, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(tg)
February 27, 2008 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Rebecca Sue Hoff. Objections to R&R due by 3/17/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 27, 2008. (tg)
August 30, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 31, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Rebecca Sue Hoff. (Cazort, Mildred)
July 5, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 07/05/2007. (cla)
July 2, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/1/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/31/2007. (mfr)
July 2, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
May 11, 2007 Summons(4) Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
May 7, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of April 30, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on April 30, 2007. (tg)
May 7, 2007 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rebecca Sue Hoff. (tg)
May 7, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rebecca Sue Hoff. (tg)
May 7, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Rebecca Sue Hoff to be filed nunc pro tunc as of April 30, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg) Modified on 5/7/2007 to add text(tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoff v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Sue Hoff
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?