Carreras v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Joseph Mark Carreras
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05084
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2008 14 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Court reverses decision of the Commissioner and remands to Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 30, 2008. cc w/copy of R&R to ALJ & OH&A(ct)
April 24, 2008 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Joseph Mark Carreras. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 24, 2008. (ct)
December 3, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 5, 2007 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Joseph Mark Carreras. (Lane, Alan)
October 23, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and allowing two additional pages. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 23, 2007. (ct)
October 19, 2007 9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Joseph Mark Carreras. (Lane, Alan)
October 5, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 11/05/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 10/05/2007. (caz)
October 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/5/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/3/2007. (sh)
October 4, 2007 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 28, 2007 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Joseph Mark Carreras. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/17/2007, answer due 10/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - ltr of service# 2 Exhibit B - Summons# 3 Exhibit C - Return Receipt)(Lane, Alan)
August 22, 2007 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Joseph Mark Carreras. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/15/2007, answer due 10/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - ltr of service# 2 Exhibit B - Summons# 3 Exhibit C - Return Receipt)(Lane, Alan)
August 20, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 10/13/2007 per service date of 8/14/07. (jn)
August 17, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Joseph Mark Carreras. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/14/2007, answer due 10/13/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - letter of service# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Return Receipt)(Lane, Alan) Modified on 8/20/2007 to correct service and answer date (jn).
May 7, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
May 7, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Joseph Mark Carreras and 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Joseph Mark Carreras; granting application to proceed ifp and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 4/30/07 . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/2/07. (ct)
May 7, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Mark Carreras filed by Joseph Mark Carreras re 2 Application. (ct)
May 7, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Joseph Mark Carreras. (ct)
May 7, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Joseph Mark Carreras. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/30/07(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carreras v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mark Carreras
Represented By: Alan L Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?