Keeland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Virginia D Keeland
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05087
Filed: May 15, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2008 10 JUDGMENT that according to 9 Memorandum Opinion the decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is affirmed and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 11, 2008. (ct)
June 11, 2008 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 11, 2008. (ct)
September 18, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 31, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Virginia D Keeland. (Fitting, Lawrence)
August 3, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 8/31/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 8/3/2007. (mfj)
August 1, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/31/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/1/2007. (rw)
July 31, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
July 12, 2007 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virginia D Keeland. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 6/12/2007 by serving U S Attorney; Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/7/07; Attorney General served on 6/27/07; answer due 8/13/2007. (ct)
June 13, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on 6-13-07. (Attachments: # 1 plaintiff's consent# 2 government's consent)(dkg)
June 11, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant (REFERRAL). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
May 15, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
May 15, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Virginia D Keeland and directing clerk to file the complaint in forma pauperis . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/15/07. (ct)
May 15, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Virginia D Keeland. (ct)
May 15, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Virginia D Keeland.(ct) Modified on 5/16/2007 to correct docket text (ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keeland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia D Keeland
Represented By: Lawrence W Fitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?