McCabe v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Carrie Tucker McCabe
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05094
Filed: May 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2008 17 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of Carrie Tucker McCabe against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 28, 2008. (ct)
July 31, 2008 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 31, 2008. (ct)
July 24, 2008 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 17, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
July 16, 2008 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Carrie Tucker McCabe. (Cazort, Mildred)
July 16, 2008 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Carrie Tucker McCabe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Statement / Billing, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
April 23, 2008 12 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY for further consideration. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 23, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct)
April 1, 2008 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Amended Complaint filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe, 1 Complaint, filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe. Objections to R&R due by 4/18/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 1, 2008. (ct)
October 29, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 15, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Carrie Tucker McCabe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A GAF Scale)(Cazort, Mildred)
September 17, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 10/15/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 09/17/2007. (cla)
September 14, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/15/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/13/2007. (mfr)
September 14, 2007 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 26, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 6/26/07. (ct)
June 22, 2007 6 Monthly MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion filed per Order dated05/30/2007 request amended in forma pauperis by Carrie Tucker McCabe. (Cazort, Mildred)
June 20, 2007 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to 1 Complaint, against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe,.(Cazort, Mildred)
June 7, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct) Modified on 6/11/2007 to edit party name in text(ct).
May 30, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe and 1 Complaint filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe directing clerk to file the complaint (nunc pro tunc as of 5/18/07) provisionally prior to a determination regarding plaintiff's status as a pauper. IFP form is returned to plaintiff with directions to file amended application to proceed by 6/22/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/30/07. (ct)
May 30, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT of Carrie McCabe filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
May 30, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carrie Tucker McCabe. (ct)
May 30, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Carrie Tucker McCabe. filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/18/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct) Modified on 6/11/2007 to correct party name in text (ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCabe v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Tucker McCabe
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?