Mills v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Larry Mills
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05095
Filed: May 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2008 14 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees and adopting Report and Recommendations, granting attorney fees In favor of Larry Mills against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 15, 2008. (ct) Modified on 8/18/2008 to edit text(tg).
July 28, 2008 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Larry Mills. Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 28, 2008. (tg)
July 21, 2008 12 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A EAJA Order dated 2/12/2008)(Hawkins, Claude)
July 10, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
July 9, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Larry Mills. (Cazort, Mildred)
July 9, 2008 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Larry Mills. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Judgment of Civil Case #07-5095, # 2 Exhibit Billing Statement for Civil Case 07-5095, # 3 Exhibit CPI INDEX)(Cazort, Mildred)
April 9, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding this case pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 9, 2008. cc: ALJ & OHA(tg)
March 10, 2008 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Larry Mills. Objections to R&R due by 3/27/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 10, 2008. (jn)
September 17, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 7, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Larry Mills. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A DOT 706.684-022# 2 Exhibit B DOT 524.685-038)(Cazort, Mildred)
August 17, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 09/14/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 08/17/2007. (cla)
August 15, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/14/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/15/2007. (rw)
August 14, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 7, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
May 30, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to be filed nunc pro tunc as of May 17, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on May 24, 2007. (tg)
May 30, 2007 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Mills. (tg)
May 30, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Mills. (tg)
May 30, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Larry Mills to be filed nunc pro tunc as of May 17, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Mills
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?