Rust v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Cheryl L Rust
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05097
Filed: May 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2008 18 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Cheryl L Rust against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 18, 2008. (tg)
November 7, 2008 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Cheryl L Rust. Objections to R&R due by 11/28/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 7, 2008. (ct)
November 3, 2008 16 AFFIDAVIT filed by Cheryl L Rust re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A EAJA STATEMENT)(Cazort, Mildred)
October 9, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Case was referred to Judge Marschewski in error. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(ct)
September 25, 2008 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 18, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
September 18, 2008 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Cheryl L Rust. (Cazort, Mildred)
September 18, 2008 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Cheryl L Rust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing Statement, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
July 17, 2008 12 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, reversing Commission's decision and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY; case terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 17, 2008. (ct)
June 24, 2008 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Cheryl L Rust. Objections to R&R due by 7/14/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 24, 2008. (ct)
October 29, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 1, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Cheryl L Rust. (Cazort, Mildred)
September 14, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/5/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/5/2007. (ct)
September 14, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER granting plaintiff's motion to Continue; Appellant Brief due by 10/5/2007. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on September 14. 2007. (ct)
September 12, 2007 7 First MOTION to Continue Appeal Brief by Cheryl L Rust. (Cazort, Mildred)
August 27, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 9-26-07. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 8-27-07. (mfj)
August 27, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/26/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/26/2007. (cap)
August 22, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
June 11, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant (REFERRAL). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
June 7, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
May 30, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cheryl L Rust; Motions terminated: 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cheryl L Rust and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 5/18/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/24/07. (ct)
May 30, 2007 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cheryl L Rust. (ct)
May 30, 2007 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cheryl L Rust. (ct)
May 30, 2007 2 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Cheryl L Rust to 1 Complaint ( Exhibit A to Complaint). (ct)
May 30, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Cheryl L Rust. Filed nunc pro tunc as of May 18, 2007(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rust v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl L Rust
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?