Reynolds v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Samuel Reynolds, Jr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05109
Filed: June 15, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2007 10 JUDGMENT granting 5 defendant's Motion to Dismiss and dismisses case with prejudice . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 9/10/07. (ct)
September 10, 2007 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 9/10/07. (ct)
September 5, 2007 8 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support by Samuel Reynolds, Jr. (Brooks, Evelyn)
September 5, 2007 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Samuel Reynolds, Jr. (Brooks, Evelyn)
August 31, 2007 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 31, 2007 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Earnest Baskerville)(Hawkins, Claude)
July 25, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on July 25, 2007. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; #(2) Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
June 15, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Robert Balfe, Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel and Attorney General,(Social Security Administration Commissioner) and returned to attorney for service (ct)
June 15, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Samuel Reynolds, Jr. and directing 1 Complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/11/07.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 6/13/07. (ct)
June 15, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed ifp by Plaintiff Samuel Reynolds, Jr. (ct)
June 15, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Samuel Reynolds, Jr. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/11/07(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Reynolds, Jr.
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?