Avery v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: Robert W. Avery
Defendant: Keith Ferguson, Drake, Chris Sparks, Benton County SWAT Team, Robert Holly, Tomlin, Carlton and Jared Crabtree
Case Number: 5:2007cv05111
Filed: June 22, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 154 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; and directing Clerk to collect the $455.00 filing fee from the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 1, 2010. (lw)
September 17, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dimissing case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 17, 2010. (tg)
September 11, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 138 . Separate defendants Harold Gage, Rick Holland, Charles Robbins, Tim Srader, Eric Warzecha, Josh Chapman and Richard Conner are dismissed with prejudice. The case is referred back to Hon. James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 11, 2009. (src)
August 21, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983)/ oral motion to voluntarily dismiss certain defendants filed by Robert W. Avery. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 21, 2009. (tg)
July 7, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 116 and denying 112 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Robert W. Avery. The Clerk of Court is directed to collect the appellate filing fee pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 7, 2009. (jn)
April 13, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 112 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Robert W. Avery. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 13, 2009. (src)
March 12, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 88 Motion for Injunctive Relief; adopting in part and not adopted in part 97 Report and Recommendations.; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 12, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
February 25, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 88 MOTION for Injunctive relief filed by Robert W. Avery, 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nathan Atchison, Eric Warzecha, Jared Crabtree, Rick Holland, Harold Gage, Josh Chapman, Wade Porter, Robert Holly, Chris Sparks, Travis Newell, Carlton, Tim Srader, Charles Robbins, Keith Ferguson, Tomlin, Jones, Drake, Petray and Richard Conner. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 25, 2009. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County SWAT Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?