Osburn v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Eddie D. Osburn
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05112
Filed: June 22, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2008 14 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 and granting 10 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Eddie D. Osburn. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 8, 2008. (ct)
April 8, 2008 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA attorney fees filed by Eddie D. Osburn. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 8, 2008. (ct)
April 2, 2008 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA attorney fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Kimer R&R and Judgment)(Hawkins, Claude)
March 28, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(cap)
March 27, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA attorney fees by Eddie D. Osburn. (Cazort, Mildred)
March 27, 2008 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA attorney fees by Eddie D. Osburn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing Statement, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
January 10, 2008 9 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY, ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 , granting 7 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 10, 2008. cc: to ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct) Modified on 1/10/2008 to correct docket text(ct).
November 28, 2007 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 7 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2007. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 28, 2007. (ct)
November 8, 2007 7 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 15, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Eddie D. Osburn. (Cazort, Mildred)
September 26, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 10/26/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 09/26/2007. (caz)
September 26, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/26/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/26/2007. (mfr)
September 26, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
July 26, 2007 Summons Issued as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney for service (ct)
June 22, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing the clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of June 14, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. 0 summonses issued. . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 06/19/07. (ct)
June 22, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT of Eddie D. Osburn filed by Eddie D. Osburn re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
June 22, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie D. Osburn. (ct)
June 22, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Eddie D. Osburn. Filed nunc pro tunc as of June 14, 2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osburn v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie D. Osburn
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?