Ellenbarger v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Richard Ellenbarger
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05119
Filed: July 11, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2008 17 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of Richard Ellenbarger against Social Security Administration Commissioner; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2008. (ct)
September 4, 2008 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Richard Ellenbarger. Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 4, 2008. (ct)
August 18, 2008 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 7, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
August 6, 2008 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Richard Ellenbarger. (Cazort, Mildred)
August 6, 2008 13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Richard Ellenbarger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Statement, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
May 21, 2008 12 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 , reversing decision of commissioner AND REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 21, 2008. (copy to OHA & ALJ) (ct) Modified on 5/22/2008 to add cc (jn).
April 21, 2008 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Richard Ellenbarger. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 21, 2008. (ct)
November 27, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 2, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Richard Ellenbarger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Change in Benefits# 2 Exhibit B Adult Disability & Work History Report# 3 Exhibit C DDS Transmittal initial claim# 4 Exhibit D Medical Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
November 2, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 2, 2007. (ct)
October 26, 2007 7 First MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Appeal Brief by Richard Ellenbarger. (Cazort, Mildred)
October 5, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 11/05/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 10/05/2007. (caz)
October 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/5/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/3/2007. (sh)
October 4, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 9, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
July 11, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of June 29, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 2, 2007. (ct)
July 11, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Ellenbarger filed by Richard Ellenbarger re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
July 11, 2007 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Ellenbarger. (ct)
July 11, 2007 2 REFILED DOCUMENT TO ATTACH EXHIBIT ***** COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Richard Ellenbarger. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/29/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A letter from Social Security)(ct)
July 11, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Richard Ellenbarger. Filed nunc pro tunc as of June 29, 2007(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellenbarger v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ellenbarger
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?