Jordan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Sharon Jordan
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05123
Filed: July 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2009 13 JUDGMENT in favor of Sharon Jordan against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 20, 2009. (tg)
March 2, 2009 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Sharon Jordan. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 2, 2009. (tg)
October 16, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(tg)
October 16, 2008 Case no longer referred to Honorable James R. Marschewski. (tg)
October 16, 2008 11 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 16, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
October 15, 2008 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Sharon Jordan. (Brooks, Evelyn)
October 15, 2008 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Sharon Jordan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1) Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A (2) Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
August 8, 2008 8 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS reversing decision of commissioner AND REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 8, 2008. cc w/copy of R&R to ALJ & OH&A(ct)
July 18, 2008 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Sharon Jordan. Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 18, 2008. (ct)
October 29, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 15, 2007 5 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Sharon Jordan. (Brooks, Evelyn)
September 17, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 10-15-07. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 9-17-07. (mfj)
September 14, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/15/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/13/2007. (cap)
September 11, 2007 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 6, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY-MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referral Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
July 18, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of the Regional Chief Counsel and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
July 18, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of July 9, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 16, 2007. (tg) Modified on 7/18/2007 to add text (tg). Modified on 7/20/2007 to correct text (jn).
July 18, 2007 2 APPLICATION/MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharon Jordan. (tg) Modified on 7/20/2007 to add text (jn).
July 18, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Sharon Jordan to be filed nunc pro tunc as of July 9, 2007.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jordan
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?