Joy-Hollis v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Hope A Joy-Hollis
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05124
Filed: July 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2008 12 JUDGMENT affirming the Commissioner's decision and dismisses case w/prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 17, 2008. (ct) Modified on 7/18/2008 to correct text(ct).
July 17, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 17, 2008. (ct)
November 26, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 26, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Hope A Joy-Hollis. (Brooks, Evelyn)
October 18, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or November 5, 2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on October 18, 2007. (lmg)
October 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/5/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/3/2007. (sh)
October 4, 2007 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
September 12, 2007 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Hope A Joy-Hollis. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/8/2007, answer due 8/28/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipt)(Brooks, Evelyn)
September 12, 2007 6 DISREGARD ENTRY - REFILED AS DOCUMENT #7 - AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Hope A Joy-Hollis served on 8/8/2007, answer due 10/8/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipt)(Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 9/12/2007 (ct).
August 20, 2007 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 20, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
August 6, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY-MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referral Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
August 3, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Application to proceed, ifp filed by Hope A Joy-Hollis, and directing plaintiff to serve defendant as directed in this order . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 1, 2007. (ct)
July 24, 2007 3 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Hope A Joy-Hollis. (tg)
July 18, 2007 2 Featured Case ORDER directing 1 Complaint be filed provisionally prior to a determination regarding plaintiff's status as a pauper. Complaint is filed nunc pro tunc as of July 9, 2007. The clerk is directed to return the in forma paupers application, without filing, for completion of the form . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 16, 2007. (ct)
July 18, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed provisionally nunc pro tunc as of 7/9/07, by Hope A Joy-Hollis.(ct) Modified on 8/1/2007 (tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joy-Hollis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope A Joy-Hollis
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?