Edmonson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Linda Edmonson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05125
Filed: July 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2008 15 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 14 Report and Recommendations and 10 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Linda Edmonson. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 23, 2008. (tg)
September 19, 2008 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Linda Edmonson. Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 19, 2008. (tg)
September 10, 2008 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kimer Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Bardt Order)(Hawkins, Claude)
September 5, 2008 12 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
September 3, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Linda Edmonson. (Cazort, Mildred)
September 3, 2008 10 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Linda Edmonson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing Statement, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred) Modified on 9/5/2008 to take out the term date (termed in error)(msj).
July 11, 2008 9 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 and ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Cast Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 11, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct) Modified on 7/11/2008 to add docket text(ct).
June 20, 2008 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Linda Edmonson. Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 20, 2008. (jn)
January 14, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 14, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Linda Edmonson. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 20, 2007 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 12/20/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 11/20/2007. (cla)
November 20, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/24/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/22/2008. (mfr)
November 20, 2007 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
September 11, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
July 18, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of July 6, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 16, 2007. (tg)
July 18, 2007 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (tg)
July 18, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linda Edmonson. (tg)
July 18, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Linda Edmonson to be filed nunc pro tunc as of July 6, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Letter dated 7/08/07)(tg) Modified on 7/18/2007 to add text (tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmonson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Edmonson
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?